EP1961725 - Odorous and aroma substances, their manufacture and utilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölscher, Bernd Hamelnerstrasse 1 37620, Halle / DE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07103066.2 | 26.02.2007 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1961725 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C33/14, C11B9/00, A61K8/34, C07C255/46 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
C07C255/46 (EP);
C07C29/17 (EP);
C07C33/14 (EP);
C11B9/0034 (EP);
C07B2200/07 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/17, C07C33/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/19] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Riech- und Aromastoffe, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [2008/35] | English: | Odorous and aroma substances, their manufacture and utilisation | [2008/35] | French: | Arômes, parfums, leur fabrication et utilisation | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/36] | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01207252 ; | PL150119B [ ] (POLITECHNIKA LODZKA, POL.); | [A] - GORA, JOZEF ET AL, "Method for manufacturing ethyl menthoxyacetate as a fragrance", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1991:43241, URL: STN, XP002444611 [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1989, no. 39, Database accession no. 1989-282548, XP002444614 & JPH01207252 A 19890821 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-9 * abstract * | [A] - SEMMLER, F. W. ET AL, "Constituents of Ethereal Oils. Constitution of Perillaldehyde, C10H14O", BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1911), vol. 44, pages 52 - 7, XP002447907 [A] 1-9 * page 56, line 33 - line L * | [A] - RYKOWSKI ET AL, "Reaction of (+)-dihydroxycarveol tosylate with KCN in aprotic solvents, (-)-(1S,2R,4S)-1-methyl-4-isopropenylcyclohexane-2-carbonitril", ANNALES UNIVERSITATIS MARIAE CURIE-SKLODOWSKA. SECTIO AA. CHEMIA, WYDAWNICTWO UNIWERSYTETU MARII CURIE-SKLODOWSKIEJ W LUBLINIE,, PL, (1993), vol. 48-49, no. 9, ISSN 0137-6853, pages 137 - 147, XP009087525 [A] 10,11 * the whole document * |