EP1841174 - Methods and systems for multifactor authentication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway, M/S 5 op 7 Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway, M/S 5 op 7 Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Novell, Inc. 1800 South Novell Place Provo, Utah 84606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burch, Lloyd L. 5966 West 8400 South Payson, UT 84651 / US | 02 /
Carter, Stephen R. 428 South Nebo Drive Spanish Fork, UT 84660 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/40] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07103081.1 | 26.02.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | US20060395725 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 395725 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841174 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841174 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F21/31 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
H04L63/0281 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
H04L63/0815 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | H04L29/06, G06F21/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Mehrfaktorauthentifizierung | [2007/40] | English: | Methods and systems for multifactor authentication | [2007/40] | French: | Procédés et systèmes d'authentification multifactorielle | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 26.02.2015 | FR | 27.04.2015 | [2016/25] |
Former [2016/07] | IE | 26.02.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004123144 (CHAN CHARLES SIU-CHEUNG [AU], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0062] *; | [A]US2005021975 (LIU GOUPING [US]) [A] 1-28 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0069] *; | [XA]EP1631032 (NOVELL INC [US]) [X] 1-7,21-28 * paragraphs [0025] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0062] - [0073] * [A] 8-20; | [X]US2006048216 (HINTON HEATHER M [US], et al) [X] 1-7,21-28 * paragraphs [0101] - [0125] * * paragraphs [0140] - [0154] * * paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0193] * * paragraphs [0197] - [0208] *; | [A] - GEIHS K ET ALL, "Single Sign-On in Service-Oriented Computing", SERVICE-ORIENTED COMPUTING - ICSOC 2003. FIRST INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTERS SCIENCE, Berlin, Germany, (2003), vol. 2910, ISBN 3-540-20681-7, pages 384 - 394, XP002439660 [A] 1-28 * section 2.1 * * section 4 * | by applicant | US2004123144 | US2005021975 | EP1631032 | US2006048216 |