EP1790900 - A Tilting Monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Jun-soo Jugong Apt. 901-1401 Youngtong-dong Suw Paldal-ku Suwon-City Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Jung, Hyun-jun Kunyoung Apt. 426-1201 1047-1 Youngtong-dong Paldal-uk Suwon-City Kyungki-do / KR | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Grey, Ian Michael, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07103142.1 | 19.11.2002 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | KR20010071860 | 19.11.2001 Original published format: KR 20010071860 | KR20020027683 | 20.05.2002 Original published format: KR 20020027683 | KR20020056429 | 17.09.2002 Original published format: KR 20020056429 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1790900 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/10 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/2092 (EP);
F16M11/24 (EP);
F16M13/02 (EP);
F16M2200/041 (EP);
F16M2200/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/22] | Title | German: | Kippbarer Monitor | [2007/22] | English: | A Tilting Monitor | [2007/22] | French: | Ecran de visualisation inclinable | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02257951.0 / EP1312851 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 27.02.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |