EP1832669 - Bond coat process for thermal barrier coating. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmerman, Jr., Robert George 5335 State Route 132 Morrow, OH 45152 / US | 02 /
Evans, John Douglas 3970 Johnson Road Springfield, OH 45502 / US | 03 /
Viguie, Rudolfo 621 Santa Clara Crestview Hills, KY 41047 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/37] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07103364.1 | 02.03.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | US20060368824 | 06.03.2006 Original published format: US 368824 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832669 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/14, C23C14/34, C23C28/00, F01D5/28 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
C23C4/18 (EP,US);
C23C14/16 (EP,US);
C23C14/5886 (EP,US);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/325 (EP,US);
C23C28/345 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2230/313 (EP,US);
F05D2230/90 (EP,US);
F05D2300/134 (EP,US);
F05D2300/15 (EP,US);
F05D2300/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/21] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Haftbeschichtungsverfahren für eine Wärmedämmbeschichtung | [2007/37] | English: | Bond coat process for thermal barrier coating. | [2007/37] | French: | Processus de revêtement de liaison pour revêtement de barrière thermique | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 12.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004067320 (SPITSBERG IRENE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0013] , [0020] - [0022] - [0026] , [0034] *; | [X]EP1498509 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] - [0008] - [0011] - [0014] - [0016] , [0017] *; | [X]US2005019491 (SPITSBERG IRENE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] , [0013] , [0020] - [0022] - [0026] , [0029] - [0032] - [0034] *; | [X]US2005053800 (RIGNEY JOSEPH DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0011] , [0012] , [0020] , [0021] *; | [X]EP1524328 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0018] , [0022] , [0037] , [0040] * |