EP1965148 - Heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Marcke Logistics N.V. Weggevoerdenlaan 5 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [2008/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Marcke, Carl Weggevoerdenlaan 5 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [2008/36] | Representative(s) | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Quintelier, Claude, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 07103430.0 | 02.03.2007 | [2008/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965148 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F24D19/0017 (EP);
F24D19/0002 (EP);
F24D19/0019 (EP);
F24D19/0034 (EP);
F24D19/0036 (EP);
F24D19/0048 (EP);
F24D19/0053 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/19] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Heizkörper | [2008/36] | English: | Heater | [2008/36] | French: | Corps de chauffe | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE29712359U (SCHMIDT RALF [DE]) [X] 1-7,10 * page 1 - page 4; figure 1 * [Y] 8,9; | [A]DE19621137 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE29804738U (VOGEL & NOOT WAERMETECHNIK AG [AT]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2,11,11a *; | [A]DE29806380U (BERG HANS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0863372 (ITEMAR IND TERMOTECNICA MARCHI [IT]) [Y] 8,9 * column 1, line 45 - line L * * column 2, line 35 - line 47 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 33; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE10160431 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1443285 (T M S TUERKER MAKINA SANAYI VE [TR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1655550 (DL RADIATORS SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021]; figures 1-6 * |