EP1967925 - Store [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interglass Technology AG Hinterbergstrasse 26 6330 Cham / CH | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnet, Roman Allmendstrasse 1 6373 Ennetbürgen / CH | 02 /
Gautschi, Rudolf Alpenquai 44 6005 Luzern / CH | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Falk, Urs Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Falk, Urs Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 07103604.0 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967925 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/401 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
G05B19/404 (EP);
G05B2219/39024 (EP);
G05B2219/45045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Speicher | [2008/37] | English: | Store | [2008/37] | French: | Unité de stockage | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4651863 (REUTER HOWARD A [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, lines 21-30 * * column 3, lines 8-24,35-50 * * column 5, lines 52-66 * * column 6, lines 29-39,56-58 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]EP0318164 (TECHNA VISION INC [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]US4871290 (KACZYNSKI ULRICH [DE], et al) [Y] 1,3,5-7 * column 1, lines 17-19 * * column 2, lines 1,2,32-37,49-68 * * column 4, lines 25-61 * * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 1; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6071060 (CAMPBELL SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 1, lines 13-19,40-50 * * column 2, lines 5-10,38-42,52-57,64-67 * * column 5, lines 25-35,42,43,52-64 * * column 6, lines 11-17,33-43 * * column 8, lines 11-22,30-39,49-55 * * column 9, lines 9-11,20-35 * * column 9, line 59 - column 10, line 4; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]US6473706 (GALLO FRANK DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, lines 35-52 * * column 3, lines 29-38,51-56 * * column 6, lines 2-40 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 11 * * column 7, line 25 - column 8, line 8; figures 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1519372 (QUANTUM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0011] , [0020] , [0022] - [0026] - [0029] - [0031] - [0034] , [0036] , [0040] , [0042]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2005073767 (GOODMAN BRIAN GERARD [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0027] , [0031] , [0045] , [0047] , [0050] , [0053]; figures 3-6 * |