EP1967480 - Frame for a multi-deck cabin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagy, Alexander Ruopigenhöhe 8 6015, Reussbühl / CH | 02 /
Urben, Andreas Giselistrasse 6 6006, Luzern / CH | 03 /
Nicole, Marcel Hirsernweg 3 6052, Hergiswil / CH | 04 /
Schüpfer, Marco Jonentalstrasse 7 8911, Rifferswil / CH | 05 /
Schaffhauser, Urs Klausbachweg 4 6037, Root / CH | 06 /
Sager, Matthias Rütliweg 4 6045, Meggen / CH | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Bogensberger Patent- & Markenbüro Fallsgasse 7 9492 Eschen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2008/37] | Gaussmann, Andreas, et al Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / NW / CH | Application number, filing date | 07103743.6 | 08.03.2007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967480 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
B66B11/02 (EP);
B66B11/0213 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/20] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fangrahmen für eine Mehrdeckkabine | [2008/37] | English: | Frame for a multi-deck cabin | [2008/37] | French: | Cadre pour cabine avec plusieurs compartiments | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1017228 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7,8; | [DA]JP2001122564 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD, et al) [DA] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] ** figures 9,10 *; | [YA]JP2005206315 (FUJITEC KK) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 1-6,9 |