EP1837199 - Ring binder mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states World Wide Stationery Manufacturing Company, Limited 19/F., Koon Wah Mirrors Factory, 3rd Industrial Building, 5-9 Ka Hing Road Kwai Chung New Territories, Hong Kong / CN | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cheng, Hung Yu G/F 21 North Yeuk Siu Lek Yuen Shatin N.T. / CN | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2009/29] |
Former [2007/39] | Schmitt, Armand, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 07103932.5 | 12.03.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | CN2006159168 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: CN200610059168 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837199 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837199 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B42F13/24, B42F13/22 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B42F13/24 (EP);
B42F13/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/39] | B42F13/24 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/17] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ringordnermechanismus | [2007/39] | English: | Ring binder mechanism | [2007/39] | French: | Mécanisme de reliure à anneaux | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 24.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE816689 (LUDWIG BREITRUECK) [Y] 13 * figure 2 *; | [Y]FR1313528 (LEITZ FA LOUIS) [Y] 17 * page 2, column 1, line 15 - line 16; figure 2 *; | [Y]GB1326393 (RELIURE IND S T D) [Y] 18 * page 1, line 26 - line 27 *; | [Y]DE3133845 (KRAUSE KG ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 19-22 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]CH675706 (CHRISTIAN WUETHRICH) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]US6146042 (TO CHUN ON WILLIAM [HK], et al) [Y] 23 * abstract *; | [XY]EP1382464 (WORLD WIDE STATIONERY MFG CO [CN]) [X] 1-7,10-12,14-16 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019]; figure 6 * [Y] 13,17-23 |