EP1992410 - Microfluidic system based on actuator elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stichting Dutch Polymer Institute John F. Kennedylaan 2 5612 AB Eindhoven / NL | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | van Wermeskerken, Stephanie Christine Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07103935.8 | 12.03.2007 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992410 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, F04B19/00, F04D33/00 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
B01L3/502707 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01F33/3038 (EP,US);
B01L3/50273 (EP,US);
B01L3/502746 (EP,US);
F04B19/006 (EP,US);
F04D33/00 (EP,US);
B01L2400/043 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0484 (EP,US);
Y10T137/206 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/47] | Title | German: | Mikrofluidisches System auf der Basis von Aktuatorelementen | [2008/47] | English: | Microfluidic system based on actuator elements | [2008/47] | French: | Système micro-fluidique basé sur des éléments actionneurs | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/37] | 16.04.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0221568 (MCNC [US], et al) [A] 1-25* the whole document *; | [X]WO2006087655 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,12-15,18-25 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0016] , [0019] - [0024] - [0061] , [0080] - [0083] * * claim 10 * * figures 1,13 * |