Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
19.06.2009 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
29.05.2009 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
07.04.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.03.2009 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
17.10.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |