Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010212762 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008IB50857 | 10.03.2008 | EP07103935 | 12.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010521285 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008IB50857 | 10.03.2008 | EP07103935 | 12.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2125216 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08719618 | 10.03.2008 | WO2008IB50857 | 10.03.2008 | EP07103935 | 12.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008110975 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07103935 | 12.03.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1992410 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07103935 | 12.03.2007 |