19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
15.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
07.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] |
24.09.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
23.07.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
04.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
26.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
14.08.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
12.08.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.08.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.04.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.04.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] |
08.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.01.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
09.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.08.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
15.08.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |