EP1970778 - Timepiece comprising a device indicating the power reserve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTRES BREGUET S.A. 1344 L'Abbaye / CH | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaugg, Alain La Combe 11 1348, Le Brassus / CH | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 07104055.4 | 13.03.2007 | [2008/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970778 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970778 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G04B9/00 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
G04B9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/38] | Title | German: | Uhr mit Anzeige der Gangreserve | [2008/38] | English: | Timepiece comprising a device indicating the power reserve | [2008/38] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie comprenant un dispositif indicateur de réserve de marche | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.2009 | BG | 16.09.2009 | CY | 16.09.2009 | CZ | 16.09.2009 | DK | 16.09.2009 | EE | 16.09.2009 | FI | 16.09.2009 | IE | 16.09.2009 | IT | 16.09.2009 | LT | 16.09.2009 | LV | 16.09.2009 | MT | 16.09.2009 | NL | 16.09.2009 | PL | 16.09.2009 | RO | 16.09.2009 | SE | 16.09.2009 | SI | 16.09.2009 | SK | 16.09.2009 | TR | 16.09.2009 | GR | 17.12.2009 | ES | 27.12.2009 | IS | 16.01.2010 | PT | 18.01.2010 | LU | 13.03.2010 | HU | 17.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
LU | 13.03.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
HU | 17.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
BG | 16.09.2009 | ||
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
MT | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
IT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
GR | 17.12.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
DK | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 16.09.2009 | |
CY | 16.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
CZ | 16.09.2009 | ||
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
RO | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
SK | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
IS | 16.01.2010 | ||
PT | 18.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
EE | 16.09.2009 | ||
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
IE | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | ||
ES | 27.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CY | 16.09.2009 | |
FI | 16.09.2009 | ||
LT | 16.09.2009 | ||
LV | 16.09.2009 | ||
NL | 16.09.2009 | ||
PL | 16.09.2009 | ||
SE | 16.09.2009 | ||
SI | 16.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US790509 (MAZER JOSEPH) [A] 1 * column 3, line 41 - line 63 * * figure 3 *; | [A]FR425795 (ADOLPHE BOURGEAT [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US1937310 (LOUIS BORNFRIEND) [A] 1 * figure 3 * |