EP1843213 - DEVELOPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/41] | Developer | ||
[2017/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veregin, Richard P N. 3515 Cherrington Crescent Mississauga Ontario L5L 5C3 / CA | 02 /
Vong, Cuong 45 Amanda Street Hamilton Ontario L9C 3H5 / CA | 03 /
Skorokhod, Vladislav 5855 Chalfont Crescent Mississauga Ontario L5M 6K4 / CA | 04 /
Parker, Jackie B. 2900 Battleford Road Apt. 816 Mississauga Ontario L5N 2V9 / CA | 05 /
Sanders, David J. 273 Pettit Court Oakville Ontario L6H 5K8 / CA | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/19] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07104214.7 | 15.03.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | US20060278762 | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 278762 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1843213 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1843213 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843213 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/087, G03G9/097 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G9/0823 (EP,US);
G03G9/08782 (EP,US);
G03G9/09708 (EP,US);
G03G9/09725 (EP,US);
G03G9/09791 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/19] |
Former [2010/17] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ENTWICKLER | [2017/04] | English: | DEVELOPER | [2017/04] | French: | RÉVÉLATEUR | [2017/04] |
Former [2007/41] | Entwickler | ||
Former [2007/41] | Developer | ||
Former [2007/41] | Révélateur | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6087059 (DUGGAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 56; claims 1,30-33,39 *; | [X]US2003017406 (GUTMAN EDWARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0033] - [0040]; claim - *; | [X]US2005250031 (MC DOUGALL MARIA N [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0044]; claims 6,16 *; | [X]US2006003244 (GRANDE MICHAEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050]; claim - *; | [PAL]US2007041060 (KIKUCHI MICHIO [JP], et al) [PAL] 1* paragraphs [0019] , [0031] * |