EP1874002 - Communication network with a plurality of nodes installed on mobile machines and corresponding process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstraße 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fitzner, Werner Paul-Schallück-Str. 4 48231, Warendorf / DE | 02 /
Wippersteg, Heinz-Hermann Borrenkampstr. 79 32257, Bünde / DE | 03 /
Steckel, Thilo Strotheide 51 33330, Gütersloh / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Fitzner, Werner Paul-Schallück-Str. 4 48231, Warendorf / DE | ||
02 /
Wippersteg, Heinz-Hermann Borrenkampstr. 79 32257, Bünde / DE | |||
03 /
Steckel, Thilo Strotheide 51 33330, Gütersloh / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Ellerbrächter, Dirk c/o CLAAS KGaA mbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Ellerbrächter, Dirk c/o CLAAS KGaA mbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Application number, filing date | 07104913.4 | 26.03.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | DE20061028909 | 21.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006028909 | [2008/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874002 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1874002 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874002 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, A01B79/00, A01B79/02, A01D41/127, A01D43/08, H04L29/06 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP,US);
A01B79/005 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/1095 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsnetz mit einer Mehrzahl von Knoten, die auf mobilen Maschinen installiert sind, und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [2008/01] | English: | Communication network with a plurality of nodes installed on mobile machines and corresponding process | [2008/01] | French: | Réseau de communication comprenant une pluralité de noeuds installés sur des machines mobiles et procédé correspondant | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 01.04.2010 | Appeal received No. T1629/10 | 25.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.09.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2007 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MT | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.03.2007 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 26.03.2007 | |
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.03.2007 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0058800 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2,5 * * page 4, line 17 - page 6, line 14 * * page 6, lines 22-26 * * page 9, lines 7-13 * * page 10, lines 29-32 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 12 *; | [A]WO0124386 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,6 * * page 4, lines 13-17 ** page 7, lines 24-31 *; | [X]EP1219153 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,2,4 * * column 35, lines 7-25 * * column 36, line 53 - column 37, line 3 * * column 37, line 53 - column 38, line 2 * * column 38, lines 16-18 * * column 38, lines 54-58 * * column 39, lines 5-13 * * column 41, lines 11-17 * * column 43, lines 2-8 * * column 44, lines 20-29 * * claim 4 *; | [A] - ADACHI T ET AL, "A HANDOFF EXAMINATION OF A HYBRID SYSTEM USING CELLULAR AND AD-HOC MODES", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (200011), vol. E83-B, no. 11, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 2494 - 2500, XP001065366 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, column 2, paragraphs 3,4 * * paragraph [0002] * | Examination | JPH07303105 | US2004063458 | by applicant | WO0058800 | EP1219153 |