EP1839762 - Optimised method of spraying a liquid and liquid-spraying device for implementing this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARECO FINANCES ET TECHNOLOGIE - ARFITEC 114, Chemin de St Marc 06130 Grasse / FR | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gschwind, Michel Chemin des Lavandières 06130 Grasse / FR | 02 /
Guerrin, Fabien Les Terrasses de Mougins 126, chemin des Peyroues 06250 Mougins / FR | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al Cabinet Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11 Boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07105021.5 | 27.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | FR20060002687 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: FR 0602687 | [2007/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839762 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B17/06 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B05B12/081 (EP);
B05B17/0607 (US);
B05B15/652 (EP,US);
B05B17/0615 (EP);
B05B15/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Optimiertes Sprühverfahren für Flüssigkeiten und Vorrichtung zum Sprühen von Flüssigkeiten für die Umsetzung dieses Verfahrens | [2007/40] | English: | Optimised method of spraying a liquid and liquid-spraying device for implementing this method | [2007/40] | French: | Procédé optimisé de pulvérisation de liquide et dispositif de pulvérisation de liquide pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0267867 (RHINOTHERM NETZER SERENI LTD [IL]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 33 - line 45 *; | [A]GB2323942 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-16* page 6, line 13 - line 24 *; | [A]WO2006029777 (BOGA GMBH GES FUER MODERNE GER [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 7, paragraph 2 * |