EP1845733 - Motion estimation device, motion estimation method, motion estimation integrated circuit, and picture coding device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iguchi, Masayasu c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
Juri, Tatsuro c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Takeshi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2007/42] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 07105392.0 | 30.03.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | JP20060102563 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006102563 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1845733 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/36, H04N7/50 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H04N19/523 (EP,US);
H04N19/426 (EP,US);
H04N19/433 (EP,US);
H04N19/51 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bewegungsschätzungsvorrichtung, Bewegungsschätzungsverfahren, integrierte Schaltung zur Bewegungsschätzung und Bildkodierungsvorrichtung | [2007/42] | English: | Motion estimation device, motion estimation method, motion estimation integrated circuit, and picture coding device | [2007/42] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'estimation du mouvement, circuit intégré d'estimation du mouvement et dispositif de codage d'images | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |