EP1844755 - Cosmetic composition comprising at least one dielectrophile monomer and a radical initiator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jegou, Gwenaëlle 29, rue des sablons 91240 Saint Michel sur Orge / FR | 02 /
Mougin, Nathalie 18, Rue Titon 75011, PARIS / FR | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
Jegou, Gwenaëlle 5, rue Henri Dunant 93190, LIVRY GARGAN / FR | ||
02 /
Mougin, Nathalie 18, Rue Titon 75011, PARIS / FR | Representative(s) | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 07105525.5 | 03.04.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | FR20060003318 | 13.04.2006 Original published format: FR 0603318 | [2007/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844755 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/36, A61K8/40, A61K8/22, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/12 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
A61K8/22 (EP);
A61K8/36 (EP);
A61K8/40 (EP);
A61Q5/06 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP);
A61K2800/95 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/26] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mindestens ein dielektrophiles Monomer und einen Radikalinitiator enthaltende kosmetische Zusammensetzung | [2007/42] | English: | Cosmetic composition comprising at least one dielectrophile monomer and a radical initiator | [2007/42] | French: | Composition cosmétique comprenant au moins un monomère dielectrophile et un amorceur radicalaire | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3634022 (ROBBINS CLARENCE R, et al) [X] 1,2,8-11,13,15-18 * the whole document * [Y] 3-7,12,14; | [DY]FR2833489 (OREAL [FR]) [DY] 3-7,12,14* page 1 - page 5; example 1; claims 12,15 * |