EP1847762 - Compact lighting device, in particular for use in a dental lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.A.R.O. FABBRICA APPARECCHIATURE RAZIONALI ODONTOIATRICHE S.p.A. Via Faro, 15 20060 Ornago (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states F.A.R.O. FABBRICA APPARECCHIATURE RAZIONALI ODONTOIATRICHE S.p.A. Via Faro, 15 20060 Ornago (Milano) / IT | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states FARO FABBRICA APPARECCHIATURE RAZIONALI ODONTOIATRICHE S.p.A. Via Faro, 15 20060 Ornago (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favonio, Angelo Via Euclide 4 20059 Vimercate (Milan) / IT | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Martegani, Franco, et al Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Martegani, Franco, et al Franco Martegani S.r.l. Via Carlo Alberto, 41 20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 07106219.4 | 16.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00770 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060770 | IT2006MI01812 | 26.09.2006 Original published format: IT MI20061812 | [2007/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1847762 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1847762 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | [2008/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847762 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, // F21W131/202, F21Y101/02 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
F21V7/0008 (EP,US);
F21V14/02 (EP);
F21V29/75 (EP);
F21V29/76 (EP);
F21V29/763 (EP);
F21V29/777 (EP);
F21K9/68 (EP,US);
F21V21/40 (EP);
F21V7/09 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Kompakte Beleuchtungsvorrichtung, insbesondere anwendbar bei einer zahnärztlichen Lampe | [2007/43] | English: | Compact lighting device, in particular for use in a dental lamp | [2007/43] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage compact, en particulier à utiliser dans une lampe dentaire | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 03.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2009 | BE | 08.07.2009 | CY | 08.07.2009 | CZ | 08.07.2009 | DK | 08.07.2009 | EE | 08.07.2009 | FI | 08.07.2009 | LT | 08.07.2009 | LV | 08.07.2009 | MT | 08.07.2009 | NL | 08.07.2009 | RO | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | SI | 08.07.2009 | SK | 08.07.2009 | TR | 08.07.2009 | BG | 08.10.2009 | GR | 09.10.2009 | IS | 08.11.2009 | PT | 09.11.2009 | HU | 09.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
MT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
HU | 09.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
MT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CY | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
MT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
MT | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
GR | 09.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
BE | 08.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2009 | ||
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
RO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
SK | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
DK | 08.07.2009 | ||
EE | 08.07.2009 | ||
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 08.07.2009 | |
FI | 08.07.2009 | ||
LT | 08.07.2009 | ||
LV | 08.07.2009 | ||
NL | 08.07.2009 | ||
SI | 08.07.2009 | ||
BG | 08.10.2009 | ||
IS | 08.11.2009 | ||
PT | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | SI | 08.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO0206723 (SIRONA DENTAL SYSTEMS GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 4 *; | [X]US6572234 (MAIER STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 16 * * figures 1,2a *; | [PA]EP1741975 (INGOLF DIEZ SIMEON MEDIZINTECH [DE]) [PA] 1 * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] ** figures 1,2 * |