Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP1847209


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2012  [2012/47]
21.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2012  [2012/43]
14.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2012  [2012/42]
07.09.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2012  [2012/41]
13.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
29.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2011  [2011/22]
15.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2011  [2011/20]
07.01.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.02.2011  [2011/06]
24.09.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.10.2010  [2010/43]
16.07.2010 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.08.2010  [2010/33]
25.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.07.2010  [2010/30]
11.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.07.2010  [2010/28]
04.06.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.07.2010  [2010/27]
16.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.05.2010  [2010/20]
09.04.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.05.2010  [2010/19]
26.03.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.04.2010  [2010/17]
07.08.2009 (Expected) grant published on  09.09.2009  [2009/37]
06.08.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.08.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2009 Change - German title published on  08.04.2009  [2009/15]
29.12.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.09.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.05.2008 Definitive list of designations published on  02.07.2008  [2008/27]
16.05.2008 First examination report
14.05.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.04.2008 Request for examination filed published on  28.05.2008  [2008/22]
21.09.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.10.2007  [2007/43]