EP1847785 - Heating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEGO-Holding GmbH Kolpingstrasse 21 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eisenhauer, Hartmut Kiesbergweg 17 74545 Michelfeld / DE | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07106363.0 | 18.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | DE20061018151 | 19.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018151 | [2007/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847785 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847785 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24H3/00, F24H9/18, H05B3/06, H05B3/50 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
H05B3/50 (EP);
F24H3/002 (EP);
F24H3/0429 (EP);
F24H3/0435 (EP);
F24H3/0447 (EP);
F24H3/0452 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Heizgerät | [2007/43] | English: | Heating device | [2007/43] | French: | Appareil de chauffage | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.04.2007 | CY | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | MT | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | AT | 18.04.2012 | LU | 18.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
AT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LU | 18.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
AT | 18.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
AT | 18.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR56471E (M. LIOUBOMIR (LOUIS) PETROVICH) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2292396 (TOURE MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3119302 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0937595 (MC MICRO COMPACT CAR AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 7 - column 8; figures 4-7 *; | [X]FR2805336 (ATLANTIC INDUSTRIE SAS [FR]) [X] 1,4 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO03005770 (SOY ERDINC [TR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003015520 (JIANG GUOMO [CN]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1432287 (CATEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0051]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP1574803 (MARIN CAMARA MIGUEL [ES]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE202005020765U (STEGO HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1* the whole document * |