EP1847712 - Peristaltic pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bredel Hose Pumps B.V. Sluisstraat 7 7491 GA Delden / NL | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oude Vrielink, Ronald Herman Hendrikus Wilhelminastraat 19 7491 EE, Delden / NL | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Schumann Patent Consultancy B.V., Kerkedennen 43 7621 EB Borne / NL | Application number, filing date | 07106678.1 | 22.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | NL20062000058 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: NL 2000058 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847712 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847712 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/12, F04B49/02, F04B51/00 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
F04B43/0072 (EP,US);
F04B43/1253 (EP,US);
F04B43/1276 (EP,US);
F04B49/02 (EP,US);
F04B51/00 (EP,US);
F05C2225/04 (EP,US);
F05C2225/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Peristaltische Pumpe | [2007/43] | English: | Peristaltic pump | [2007/43] | French: | Pompe péristaltique | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.08.2009 | BE | 05.08.2009 | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | LT | 05.08.2009 | LV | 05.08.2009 | MT | 05.08.2009 | PL | 05.08.2009 | RO | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | SI | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | IS | 05.12.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | IE | 22.04.2010 | LU | 22.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
MT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
LU | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
MT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CY | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
MT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
MT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
MT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
IT | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
IE | 22.04.2010 | ||
IT | 22.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
BE | 05.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
CZ | 05.08.2009 | ||
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
RO | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
DK | 05.08.2009 | ||
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 05.08.2009 | |
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
LV | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
SI | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB783884 (ROBERT EDWARD DAVID CLARK) [X] 1-8 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 42 * * page 2, line 125 - page 5, line 11 * * claim 3 * * figure 1 * [Y] 13,14; | [Y]EP0013002 (ARA WERK KRAEMER GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * figure 2 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4228930 (HOGAN LAWRENCE R) [A] 1-5,13 * figures 2,4 * * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 12 * * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 53 *; | [DY]GB2290582 (RIVERLYNX LTD [GB]) [DY] 1-8 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 3 - page 3, line 35 * * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2004011810 (BOC GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 13,14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * claims 1,17-23,26 *; | [A]WO2005086760 (JOUBERT DIRK [US], et al) [A] 13,14 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 12 * * page 7, line 1 - page 11, line 4 ** claims 1-3 * |