EP1858003 - Measuring device for a hearing aid and corresponding measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weidner, Tom Kössweg 15 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Berg, Peter Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07106688.0 | 23.04.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | DE20061023735 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006023735 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858003 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858003 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/175, // H04R25/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
H04R25/30 (EP,US);
G10K11/17854 (EP,US);
G10K11/17861 (EP,US);
G10K11/17875 (EP,US);
G10K11/17881 (EP,US);
G10K11/17885 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Messbox für eine Hörvorrichtung und entsprechendes Messverfahren | [2007/47] | English: | Measuring device for a hearing aid and corresponding measuring method | [2007/47] | French: | Boîte de mesure pour un dispositif auditif et procédé de mesure correspondant | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 23.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IE | 08.10.2008 | LT | 08.10.2008 | LV | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | PL | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | ES | 19.01.2009 | IS | 08.02.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | AT | 23.04.2009 | LU | 23.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
AT | 23.04.2009 | ||
LU | 23.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
AT | 23.04.2009 | ||
LU | 23.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
AT | 23.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/43] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
AT | 23.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | CZ | 08.10.2008 | |
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 08.10.2008 | |
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | SI | 08.10.2008 | |
ES | 19.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9847133 (UNIV DAYTON [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * page 1, line 21 - line 25 * * page 4, line 8 - line 11 * * page 7, line 2 - page 8, line 25 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2000179068 (KUMAGAI GUMI CO LTD, et al) [A] 3,7 * abstract *; | [A]US6119808 (STEEDMAN JAMES B [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * column 4, line 19 - line 28 *; | [A]DE10046098 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-6,8-11 * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]DE102004051226 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 3,7* paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0005] * | by applicant | JP2000179068 | DE10046098 |