09.10.2020 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
07.10.2020 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.06.2020 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
15.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
03.05.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.01.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.09.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
01.11.2014 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
01.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.06.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
24.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.11.2008 |
First examination report |
|
12.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.09.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
29.08.2008 |
Publication of search report |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
05.10.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
05.10.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |