Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8040917 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2011 | B2 | US2007258481 | 08.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060040044 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100755714B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20060040044 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4634412B | Global Dossier | 16.02.2011 | B2 | JP2007300610 | 15.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060040044 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1853058 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2008 | A3 | EP1853058 | 07.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20060040044 | 03.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101068361 | 07.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20060040044 | 03.05.2006 |