Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8317391 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2012 | B2 | US2011164478 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5524827B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2014 | B2 | JP2010539440 | 16.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2142965 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B2 | EP2142965 | 10.11.2010 | B1 | EP2142965 | 13.01.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | EP08736544 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE487965T | 15.11.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101669075B | 29.02.2012 | B | CN101669075 | 10.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602008003429D1 | 23.12.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1142693 | 10.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | WO2008EP55009 | 24.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008132135 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2009 | A3 | WO2008132135 | 06.11.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1986059 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07106986 | 26.04.2007 |