EP1849670 - Vehicle brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Aichi-ken Toyota-shi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Aichi-ken Toyota-shi 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushihi Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Aichi-ken Toyota-shi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okano, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, TOYOTA-CHO TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Otomo, Akihiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, TOYOTA-CHO TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Fukasawa, Tsukasa c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, TOYOTA-CHO TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | [2010/18] |
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
Okano, Takahiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, TOYOTA-CHO TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Otomo, Akihiro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, TOYOTA-CHO TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Fukasawa, Tsukasa c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, TOYOTA-CHO TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07107058.5 | 26.04.2007 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20060125450 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006125450 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849670 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849670 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/26, B60T8/40, B60T8/50 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B60T8/4081 (EP,US);
B60T8/266 (EP,US);
B60T8/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/28] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bremssystem für ein Fahrzeug | [2007/44] | English: | Vehicle brake system | [2007/44] | French: | Système de freinage pour véhicule | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 29.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0232734 (TRW LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13* abstract *; | [Y]EP1642795 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * figure 2 * | by applicant | JPH11180294 | WO0232734 | EP1642795 |