Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2011 [2011/16] |
09.04.2010 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
02.04.2010 | Change - inventor | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
30.03.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.03.2010 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
16.03.2010 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
10.11.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
25.04.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
05.12.2008 | First examination report | |
02.12.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.09.2008 | Change: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
17.09.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
06.06.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
04.06.2008 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant | |
28.09.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
28.09.2007 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |