EP1854404 - Monitoring of the state of the central nervous system of a subject [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/46] | Monitoring of the state of the central nervous system of a subjet | ||
[2008/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Finland Oy Kuortaneenkatu 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarkela, Mika Santavuorentie 7 A 2 FIN-00400, Helsinki / FI | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/46] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07107194.8 | 30.04.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | US20060431139 | 09.05.2006 Original published format: US 431139 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1854404 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1854404 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854404 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0476 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
A61B5/4821 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (EP,US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
A61B5/4064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Überwachung des Zustands des zentralen Nervensystems einer Person | [2007/46] | English: | Monitoring of the state of the central nervous system of a subject | [2008/07] | French: | Surveillance de l'état du système nerveux central d'une personne | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/46] | Monitoring of the state of the central nervous system of a subjet | Examination procedure | 12.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 15.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | LT | 14.10.2009 | LV | 14.10.2009 | MT | 14.10.2009 | PL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | IS | 14.02.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | FR | 30.04.2010 | IE | 30.04.2010 | LU | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
LU | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
FR | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
MT | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
IE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
LT | 14.10.2009 | ||
LV | 14.10.2009 | ||
PL | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
IS | 14.02.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0232305 (INSTRUMENTARIUM CORP [FI]) [A] 1-15 * page 12, line 9 - line 18 * * page 12, line 26 - line 27 * * page 14, line 30 - page 15, line 1 * * page 17, line 20 - line 25 * * page 19, line 11 - line 14 * * page 19, line 29 - page 20, line 8 * * page 26, line 17 - line 21 * * page 27, line 5 - line 10 * * claim 73 * * figures 6,11 *; | [A]EP1468646 (INSTRUMENTARIUM CORP [FI]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] , [0016] , [0019] , [0025] *; | [A]EP1537823 (NAT INST INF & COMM TECH [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0011] , [0031] , [0034] *; | [A]US2006079801 (DELUCA CARLO J [US], et al) [A] 15 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0032] * * figures 2,3,5,6,8,9 *; | [DA] - ANTON VAN BOXTEL ET AL, "Motor Unit Firing Rate During Static Contraction Indicated by the Surface EMG Power Spectrum", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (198309), vol. BME-19, no. 9, ISSN 0018-9294, pages 601 - 609, XP011173526 [DA] 1-15 * abstract * * page 602, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 603, column 2, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * page 606, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 * |