EP1884852 - Tuning procedure for aircraft fault detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2008/06] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ganguli, Subhabrata 12415 44th Place North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | 02 /
Papageorgiou, George 2572 Kenzie Terrace Apt. 205 Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | 03 /
Glavaski-Radovanovic, Sonja 11435 50th Place North Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07107505.5 | 04.05.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | US20060462481 | 04.08.2006 Original published format: US 462481 | [2008/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884852 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884852 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, B64D43/00, G01C23/00, // G08G5/00, G06F11/00 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
G08G5/0052 (EP,US);
G05B23/0254 (EP,US);
G08G5/0021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einstellverfahren für die Fehlererkennung bei Flugzeugen | [2008/06] | English: | Tuning procedure for aircraft fault detection | [2008/06] | French: | Procédure de réglage pour la détection des défaillances d'un avion | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 07.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4022954 (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - line 28 * * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 4; figure 1 *[A] 8; | [YA]WO9800334 (SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 13, paragraph 4 - page 15, paragraph 2; figure 3 * [A] 3,4; | [YA]EP1122694 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 7; figure 1 * * page 4, line 43 - line 49; figure 3 * * page 5, line 47 - line 53 * * page 8, line 12 - line 29; figure 6 * * page 8, line 44 - line 57; figure 8 * [A] 3,4; | [YA]US6298286 (YING SIDNEY S [US]) [Y] 1,2,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - line 32 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 7; figure 1 * * column 8, line 49 - column 10, line 31; figure 2 * [A] 3-6 | by applicant | US6298286 |