EP1855067 - Attachment and connection module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gealan Formteile GmbH Hofer Strasse 72-74 95145 Oberkotzau / DE | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Thomas Naabweg 3 95234 Sparneck / DE | 02 /
Saunus, Christian Krumme Str. 12 08223 Grünbach / DE | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07107836.4 | 09.05.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | DE20061021587 | 09.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006021587 | [2007/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855067 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1855067 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24H9/12, F24H9/14 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
F24H9/14 (EP);
F24H9/13 (EP);
F24H9/144 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2014/02] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anschluss- und Verbindungsmodul | [2007/46] | English: | Attachment and connection module | [2007/46] | French: | Module de fermeture et de raccordement | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9312237U (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,8 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 3; figures 3-5 *; | [X]DE19709583 (KESSLER PETER [DE]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 33 - line 68; figure 5 *; | [A]WO03023905 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - line 17 *; | [X]WO03069251 (VALEO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 16 - line 28 * * page 4, line 7 - line 13 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 8 * * page 11, line 15 - line 19 *; | [X]DE102005004521 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057]; figures 14-16 *; | [A]US2006054306 (KENT SCOTT E [US], et al) [A] 1-8* figures 2,4; claim 1 * |