EP1832259 - Pulse amplitude manipulation for controlling a phacoemulsification surgical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. P.O. Box 62 Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | [2009/32] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states Alcon, Inc. Bösch 69 6331 Hünenberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boukhny, Mikhail 24922 Monte Verde Drive Laguna Niguel, CA 92677 / US | 02 /
Dacquay, Bruno 3 Candlebush Irvine, CA 92612 / US | 03 /
Fanney, Douglas M. 109 Arista San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07107964.4 | 16.08.2006 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | US20050216475 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: US 216475 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832259 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832259 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007, B06B1/02, A61B17/22, // A61B17/00 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
A61F9/00745 (EP,US);
B06B1/0215 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00159 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00172 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00176 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00181 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00977 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/37] | Title | German: | Manipulation der Pulsamplitude zur Steuerung eines chirurgischen Phacoemulsifikationssystems | [2007/37] | English: | Pulse amplitude manipulation for controlling a phacoemulsification surgical system | [2007/37] | French: | Manipulation de l'amplitude d'impulsion pour le contrôle d'un système chirurgical de phaco-émulsification | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06118991.6 / EP1759674 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | CZ | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | EE | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | LT | 10.06.2009 | LV | 10.06.2009 | NL | 10.06.2009 | PL | 10.06.2009 | RO | 10.06.2009 | SI | 10.06.2009 | SK | 10.06.2009 | TR | 10.06.2009 | IE | 16.08.2009 | LU | 16.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | BG | 10.09.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | IS | 10.10.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | HU | 11.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
LU | 16.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
HU | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
LU | 16.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
IE | 16.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
IS | 10.10.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
LT | 10.06.2009 | ||
LV | 10.06.2009 | ||
NL | 10.06.2009 | ||
PL | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004092921 (KADZIAUSKAS KENNETH E [US], et al); | [PX]US2005209621 (GORDON RAPHAEL [US], et al); | [PX]US2005277869 (BOUKHNY MIKHAIL [US]) | by applicant | US3589363 | US4223676 | US4246902 | US4493694 | US4515583 | US4589415 | US4609368 | US4869715 | US4922902 | US4989583 | US5154694 | US5359996 | US6179808 | US6261283 | US6402769 | WO2004080505 | US2005277869 |