EP1855087 - System and method for reducing the amount of repetitive data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. LG Twin Towers 20, Yeouido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2014/26] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states PROMIND CO., LTD. 102 Sinsa Bl. 3-1 Nonhyun-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-010 / KR | ||
Former [2013/49] | For all designated states WI-GUI, LLC 1069 Thomas Jefferson Street, NW Washington, D.C. 2700 / US | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Intellisist, Inc. 12342 N.E. 26th Place Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odinak, Gilad 12342 N.E. 26th Place Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | 02 /
Phillips, Marc 4008 Gros Ventre Avenue San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 03 /
Chaubey, Nishith K 11807 Westview Parkway San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Free, Rachel Alder, et al 90 High Holborn Olswang WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07108014.7 | 27.03.2002 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | US20010280378P | 29.03.2001 Original published format: US 280378 P | US20010884856 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: US 884856 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855087 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1855087 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G08G1/096811 (EP,US);
G01C21/3629 (EP,US);
G01C21/3655 (EP,US);
G08G1/096872 (EP,US);
G10L13/00 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Reduktion des Volumens repetitiver Daten | [2007/46] | English: | System and method for reducing the amount of repetitive data | [2007/46] | French: | Système et procédé pour la réduction de la quantité de données répétitives | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2019 | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | 18.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02721599.5 / EP1436760 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020721599) is 02.08.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0766811 (SHIELDS ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1-9,16-18,20,21 * pages 3,4, paragraphs 19-21,23,25,26 * * page 6, paragraphs 38,39,43 * * page 6, paragraphs 45,47-49 * * page 10, paragraph 78 - page 11, paragraph 81 * * page 11, paragraph 86 * * pages 12-14, paragraphs 94,106-114,121 * * figures 1,6-10 *; | [X]FR2762906 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,16-18,21 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 23 * * page 4, line 8 - line 16 * * page 5, line 16 - line 29 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 13 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 29 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0899704 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 15,19 * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 11 - paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraphs 20,21 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0911783 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-21 * page 2, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 3, paragraphs 21,22,25 * * page 4, paragraphs 26,30,33-39 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0933616 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-9,16-18,21 * page 3, paragraph 14 - paragraph 16 * * page 3, paragraph 22 - page 5, paragraph 41 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1005627 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,16-18,21 * page 2, paragraph 9 - page 3, paragraph 16 * * page 4, paragraph 22 - paragraph 26 * * page 6, paragraphs 44,45,48 * * page 20, paragraph 185 - paragraph 194 * * page 27, paragraph 266 * * figures 1-3 * | Examination | EP1003016 | by applicant | EP0766811 | FR2762906 | EP0911783 | EP0933616 | EP1005627 |