EP1886708 - Lamp with melatonin protection effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizer Straße 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | [2010/40] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Schweizer Strasse 30 6850 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swoboda, Gerald Am Reutelebach 13 6911 Lochau / AT | 02 /
Schumann, Sabine Auwiesenstrasse 51 9030 Abtwil / CH | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Thun, Clemens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108143.4 | 14.05.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | DE20061037222 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037222 | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886708 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886708 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M21/02, H05B37/02 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
A61M21/00 (EP,US);
H05B41/36 (EP);
H05B47/10 (EP,US);
H05B47/16 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0044 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Leuchte mit "Melatonin-schonender" Wirkung | [2008/07] | English: | Lamp with melatonin protection effect | [2008/07] | French: | Eclairage à effet augmentant la mélatonine | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2011
08.07.2011
ADMISSIBLE TRILUX GmbH & Co. KG Heidestrasse 4 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2011
TRILUX GmbH & Co. KG Heidestrasse 4 59759 Arnsberg / DE Opponent's representative Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 10.08.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.05.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.05.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.09.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2020/10] | Appeal following opposition | 10.07.2014 | Appeal received No. T1511/14 | 05.09.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.09.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 20.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | LU | 14.05.2011 | BE | 31.05.2011 | FR | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | AT | 14.05.2019 | [2020/11] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
HU | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
LU | 14.05.2011 | ||
BE | 31.05.2011 | ||
FR | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
SI | 06.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11135273 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1,2,6,12-14,17,21 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH11144510 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,6,12-14,17,21 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2001149478 (DAITOKU SHINICHI) [X] 1-5,11,12,15,16,18,19 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2003288995 (TOTO LTD) [X] 1-10,12,13,15,16,19-21,23,24* the whole document *; | [X]JP2005310654 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-7,10,12-21 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1619648 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,12,15,16,18-21 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006152525 (WOOG KENNETH M [US]) [X] 1-5,9,11,12,15,16,19,20,23,24 * the whole document *; | [PX]JP2006252944 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY) [PX] 1-24 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034]; figures 2-5,8,11 * | by applicant | JPH11135273 | JPH11144510 | EP1577163 | EP1619648 |