EP1992606 - Alkene acetals and their use as odorous substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilk, Erich Meiernberg 10 37603, Holzminden / DE | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108215.0 | 15.05.2007 | [2008/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1992606 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/15, C07D317/12, C07D319/06, C07D321/06, C11B9/00 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
C07C43/303 (EP);
A61K8/33 (EP);
A61K8/4973 (EP);
A61K8/498 (EP);
A61Q13/00 (EP);
C07D317/12 (EP);
C07D319/06 (EP);
C07D321/06 (EP);
C11B9/0015 (EP);
C11B9/0076 (EP);
C11B9/008 (EP);
C11B9/0084 (EP);
C11D3/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/30] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Alkenacetale und ihre Verwendung als Riechstoffe | [2008/47] | English: | Alkene acetals and their use as odorous substances | [2008/47] | French: | Acétals d'alcènes et leur utilisation en tant que parfums | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4085148 (CLEARE PETER JOHN VERNON) [X] 1,3 * example 2 *; | PL104948B [ ] (POLITECHNIKA LODZKA, POL.); | [X]US4169860 (ANDERSON RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * Verbindung XI in Spalte 2 und in Beispiel 2 *; | PL167443B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL167423B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL167990B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL167975B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | [X]US5637718 (BIRD GRAHAM [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * example 1a *; | PL175847B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL175744B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL176018B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL181745B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | PL181907B [ ] (AKAD ROLNICZA [PL]); | [X]US6395695 (SIVIK MARK ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,5 * example 7 *; | [X] - OBARA, ROBERT ET AL, "Preparation of novel cyclic acetals of (E)-3,3,7-trimethyl-4-octen-1-al", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:731993, URL: STN, XP002457061 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - OBARA, ROBERT ET AL, "Preparation of novel cyclic acetals of (Z)-3,7-dimethyl-4-octen-1-al with floral aroma", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:371843, URL: STN, XP002457062 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - SANIGORSKA, JANINA ET AL, "Preparation of novel 1,3-dioxanes as cyclic acetals of (E)-3,3,7-trimethyl-4-octen-1-al", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:731995, URL: STN, XP002457063 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - OBARA, ROBERT ET AL, "Preparation of novel derivatives of (E)-3,7,7-trimethyl-4-octen-1-al", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2000:654840, URL: STN, XP002457064 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - OBARA, ROBERT ET AL, "Preparation of novel derivatives of (E)-3,7,7-trimethyl-4-octen-1-al", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1999:327207, URL: STN, XP002457065 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - WAWRZENCZYK, CZESLAW ET AL, "Preparation of novel cyclic acetals of (E)-3,7-dimethyl-4-octen-1-al with floral aroma", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:371844, URL: STN, XP002457066 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - OBARA, ROBERT ET AL, "Method of manufacturing novel (Z)-3,7-dimethyl-4-octenal acetals", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:237483, URL: STN, XP002457067 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - WAWRZENCZYK, CZESLAW ET AL, "Method of manufacturing novel (E)-3,7-dimethyl-4-octenal acetals", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:237482, URL: STN, XP002457068 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - KULA, JOZEF ET AL, "3-Isopropenylenanthole and 3-isopropylenanthole aldehydes", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1981:461499, URL: STN, XP002457069 [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - OBARA, ROBERT ET AL, "Process and catalyst for the preparation of trans-3,7,7-trimethyl-4-octen- 1-al acetals", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1999:342825, URL: STN, XP002457070 [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 7804226, URL: XFIRE, XP002457071 [X] 1-3,5 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 4967216, URL: XFIRE, XP002457072 [X] 1,3,5 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 4411117, URL: XFIRE, XP002457073 [X] 1,3 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 9327099, 9327098, URL: XFIRE, XP002457074 [X] 1,3 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 3604887, URL: XFIRE, XP002457075 [X] 1,3 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 3602965, URL: XFIRE, XP002457076 [X] 1-3 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 3602069, URL: XFIRE, XP002457077 [X] 1,3 * column A * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 1635897, URL: XFIRE, XP002457078 [X] 1,3 * column A * | [X] - HEATH, R. R. ET AL, "Sex pheromone of the white peach scale: highly stereoselective synthesis of the stereoisomers of pentagonol propionate", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1980:470916, URL: STN, XP002457079 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - MULZER, JOHANN ET AL, "Tandem Claisen-Diels-Alder reactions", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1991:206615, URL: STN, XP002457080 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - UEMATSU, TAMON ET AL, "Pheromone synthesis. Part LVIII. Synthesis of both the enantiomers of eldanolide (trans-3,7-dimethyl-6-octen-4-olide), the wing gland pheromone of the male African sugarcane borer", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1983:422160, URL: STN, XP002457081 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - RE, L. ET AL, "Cyclization of 3-carboxy-3,6-dimethyl-1,5-heptadiene, a terpene acid with the skeleton of artemisia ketone", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1959:56593, URL: STN, XP002457082 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - BAUDOUY, RENE ET AL, "Stereoselective synthesis of a component of a sex pheromone of California Red Scale: (3Z,6R)-6-isopropenyl-3-methyl-3,9-decadien-1-yl acetate", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1990:119121, URL: STN, XP002457083 [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [X] - PEREIRA, SCHUBERT ET AL, "A study of hydroboration of alkenes and alkynes with pinacolborane catalyzed by transition metals", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1996:295492, URL: STN, XP002457084 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - NONOSHITA, KATSUMASA ET AL, "Organoaluminum-promoted Claisen rearrangement of allyl vinyl ethers", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1990:54934, URL: STN, XP002457085 [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 4418762, 4413543, 4396902, URL: XFIRE, XP002457093 [X] 1 * column A * | [X] - ROBERT OBARA ET AL, "Odoriferous derivatives of (E)-3,7,7-trimethyl-4-octen-1-ol and its 7-sila analogue", J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1995), vol. 46, pages 321 - 328, XP009091602 [X] 1-10 * Das ganze Dokument, insbesonders die letzten vier Verbindungen in der linken Spalte von Tabelle I * | [ ] - J. ORG. CHEM, (1997), vol. 62, no. 13, pages 4313 - 4320 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, no. 14, pages 4541 - 4546 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1984), vol. 25, no. 41, pages 4685 - 4688 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 58, no. 41, pages 8307 - 8312 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1990), vol. 31, no. 17, pages 2407 - 2410 | [ ] - J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. 1, (1990), vol. 7, pages 2099 - 2108 | [ ] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, no. 8, pages 3018 - 3028 | [ ] - CHEM. BER., (1979), vol. 112, pages 3273 - 3280 | [ ] - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1987), vol. 28, no. 21, pages 2363 - 2366 |