EP1953613 - A timepiece apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Electronics & Watch Co. Ltd. 15/F, Shing Dao Ind. Bldg. 232 Aberdeen Main Road Aberdeen, Hong Kong / CN | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAI, Kwong Yuen National Electronics & Watch Co. Ltd. 15/F, Shing Dao Ind. Bldg. 232 Aberdeen Main Road Aberdeen, Hong Kong / CN | [2011/32] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
WAI, Kwong Yuen National Electronics & Watch Co. Ltd. 15/F, Shing Aberdeen, Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Vogel, Andreas, et al Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Vogel, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel, Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108324.0 | 16.05.2007 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | CN200710101118 | 31.01.2007 Original published format: CN200710101118 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953613 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953613 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953613 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G04G21/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
G04C3/004 (EP,US);
G04G21/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/32] | G04G1/02, G04C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Zeitmesseinrichtung | [2008/32] | English: | A timepiece apparatus | [2008/32] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 21.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2010 | 03.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2007 | AT | 17.08.2011 | BE | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | DK | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | IT | 17.08.2011 | LT | 17.08.2011 | LV | 17.08.2011 | MT | 17.08.2011 | NL | 17.08.2011 | PL | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | ES | 28.11.2011 | IS | 17.12.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | GB | 16.05.2012 | IE | 16.05.2012 | LU | 16.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
LU | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
MT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
ES | 28.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
GB | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
DK | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
BE | 17.08.2011 | ||
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
LV | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
PL | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
LT | 17.08.2011 | ||
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 17.08.2011 | |
NL | 17.08.2011 | ||
IS | 17.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4109457 (LAESSER CLAUDE, et al) [A] 11-13 * column 2; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]GB2120815 (TURNRIGHT CONTROLS) [X] 1-3,6-8,11,14 * pages 1-4; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5,9,10,12,13; | [Y]US5572489 (BORN JEAN-JACQUES [CH], et al) [Y] 12,13 * columns 2,3,5; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US6134189 (CARRARD JEAN-DANIEL [CH]) [X] 1,3-8,14 * columns 1-3,5,7; figures 8,10,11 * [Y] 4,5,9,10; | [Y]US2004100440 (LEVIN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [Y] 9,10 * pages 4,5; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1734370 (EQUIPMAKE LTD [GB]) [A] 11-13* columns 1,2; figure 1 * |