EP1860177 - Cleaning article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bolton Manitoba SpA Via G.B. Pirelli 19 20124 Milano / IT | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agostini, Andrea Via Solferino 11 20121 Milano / IT | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07108527.8 | 21.05.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00999 | 22.05.2006 Original published format: IT MI20060999 | [2007/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860177 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/04, C11D3/39 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C11D17/049 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D17/046 (EP);
C11D3/39 (EP);
C11D3/395 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | Reinigungsartikel | [2007/48] | English: | Cleaning article | [2007/48] | French: | Article de détergence | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0073541 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-41,1,2,14,15,21,24-27,39,41 * example 1 *; | [X]EP0118191 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-41,1-4,10,11,14-16,18,19,21,23-25,38-40 * page 10 - page 11 * * page 21, line 17 * * page 16, line 34 * * page 24, line 20 - page 30, line 7 * * examples 2,5-8 *; | [X]US4613446 (MAGYAR ARPAD M [US]) [X] 1-41,32 * figure 2 *; | [X]US2005107282 (FORD FRANCIS C [US], et al) [X] 1-41,1-5,9,14,15,19,21-27,36-40 * examples 1,4D,4E ** paragraphs [0069] , [0109] , [0073] - [0106] * |