EP1865161 - Internal combustion engine and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winsor, Richard / 1604 Dakota Drive Waterloo, IA Iowa 50701 / US | [2012/09] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
Winsor, Richard 1604 Dakota Drive Waterloo, IA 50701 / US | Representative(s) | John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Löser, Iris Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Löser, Iris Deere & Company European Office Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07108755.5 | 23.05.2007 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | US20060444693 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: US 444693 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1865161 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1865161 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865161 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/021, F01N3/031, F01N3/037, F02B37/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F01N13/017 (EP,US);
F01N3/021 (EP,US);
F01N3/0238 (EP,US);
F01N3/031 (EP,US);
F01N3/037 (EP,US);
F01N13/107 (EP,US);
F01N2470/16 (EP,US);
F01N2470/18 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2010/01] |
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbrennungsmotor und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2007/50] | English: | Internal combustion engine and method | [2007/50] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne et procédé | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.06.2012 | [2012/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0308972 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11,12 * column 6, line 50 - column 9, line 26 ** column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 28; figures 1,6-8 *; | [Y]JPH0828247 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [Y] 9,15 * abstract *; | [XY]EP0823545 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13,16 * column 3, line 58 - column 7, line 54; figures 4-7 * [Y] 9,10,15; | [A]EP1162351 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0033] - [0039] - [0058] - [0061] - [0066] - [0072]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1319811 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0147]; figure 25 * | by applicant | EP0823545 |