EP1847360 - Razor cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2017 | Correction of patent specification | published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feintechnik GmbH Eisfeld Seeweg 4 98673 Eisfeld / DE | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzknecht, Franz Oberradein 51 39040, Radein / IT | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Engel, Christoph Klaus PATENTSCHUTZengel Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Engel, Christoph Klaus Engel Patentanwaltskanzlei Marktplatz 6 98527 Suhl/Thüringen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07109567.3 | 15.06.2004 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | DE2003127739 | 18.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10327739 | [2007/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847360 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847360 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1847360 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/22 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
B26B21/225 (EP);
B26B21/521 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Rasierklingeneinheit für einen Rasierapparat | [2007/43] | English: | Razor cartridge | [2007/43] | French: | Cartouche de rasoir | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 29.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04013932.1 / EP1488894 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IE | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | PL | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | AT | 15.06.2010 | LU | 15.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
AT | 15.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
AT | 15.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2030909 (WILKINSON SWORD LTD) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA]US4413411 (TROTTA ROBERT A [US]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO8910245 (KOEPPEN DETLEF [DE]) [A] * page 9; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US6425184 (MIN BO SIK [KR]) [A] * the whole document * |