EP1865234 - Method for operating a drive train [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Popp, Christian Kümmertsweiler 8 88079, Kressbronn / DE | 02 /
Steinhauser, Klaus Zimbaweg 9 88079, Kressbronn / DE | [2007/50] | Application number, filing date | 07109577.2 | 05.06.2007 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | DE20061026600 | 08.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006026600 | [2007/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1865234 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1865234 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865234 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/06 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
F16H61/686 (EP,US);
F16H63/502 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0451 (EP,US);
F16H2200/006 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2012 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2043 (EP,US);
F16H2306/14 (EP,US);
F16H2306/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Antriebsstrangs | [2007/50] | English: | Method for operating a drive train | [2007/50] | French: | Procédé destiné au fonctionnement dýune chaîne cinématique | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IE | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | LT | 10.03.2010 | LV | 10.03.2010 | MT | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | PL | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | LU | 05.06.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | ES | 21.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | IS | 10.07.2010 | PT | 12.07.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
LU | 05.06.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
ES | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
PT | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19928674 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 30 - column 6, line 42; figures 1-4 *; | [DA]DE10035479 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [DA] 1-16 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036]; figure 1 *; | [AY]EP1219868 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0042] - [0046]; figures 13,14 * [Y] 6,12; | [A]US6577939 (KEYSE BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 6, line 59 - column 13; figures 5-20 *; | [A]US6623397 (RAGHAVAN MADHUSUDAN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2003220170 (NISHIDA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0100] - [0178]; figures 7-14 *; | [A]DE10321961 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [AY]EP1398536 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 6,12; | [A]DE10338624 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE10330153 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1533543 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2005065981 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [Y] 12 * page 6, paragraph 1 - page 8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10361288 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE102004001380 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0006] - [0025] *; | [A]US2005282680 (SOH BYEONG H [KR]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]US2006046892 (BUCKNOR NORMAN K [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004040611 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004043345 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0050]; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE10035479 | EP1219868 | US6577939 | US2003220170 | EP1398537 |