EP2014889 - A method for thermally managing an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 800 Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 800 Fairlane Plaza South 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALMKVIST, Göran Furuvägen 5 SE-443 31, LERUM / SE | 02 /
EKDAHL, Roy Tranbärsvägen 65 SE-448 37, FLODA / SE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Magnus Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Holmberg, Magnus Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07110663.7 | 20.06.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014889 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/02, F01P7/16 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
F01P3/02 (EP);
F01P7/162 (EP);
F01P7/164 (EP);
F01P2060/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wärmeverwaltung eines Verbrennungsmotors | [2009/03] | English: | A method for thermally managing an internal combustion engine | [2009/03] | French: | Procédé de gestion thermique d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS56148677 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 9 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 1,10; | [A]US4559907 (HAYASHI YOSHIMASA [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, lines 55-57 * * column 4, lines 5-14 * * column 6, lines 27-32 *; | [A]FR2571431 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]) [A] 1,4-6,14,15 * page 3, lines 14-16 * * page 7, lines 13-21 *; | [A]EP0442489 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * figures 5,6,10 *; | [X]EP0557113 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-21 * column 7, lines 13-33 * * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 21 * * column 17, line 23 - column 19, line 33 * * figure - *; | [A]DE19803884 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4-6,14,15 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 4 * * column 6, lines 31-42 *; | [A]EP1239129 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP [JP]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0047] , [0048] *; | [XY]GB2420847 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1-8,10-21 * page 14, lines 9-25 * * page 15, line 35 - page 16, line 13 * * figure - * [Y] 9; | [X]JP2006214280 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 10,13,15 * abstract * * figure - * * paragraphs [0056] , [0068] , [0073] * |