EP1872898 - Machine tool comprising a gantry and a tool holder with two perpendicular rotational axes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOBS S.p.A. Via Emilia Parmense, 164 Fraz. Montale 29100 Piacenza / IT | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Jobs S.p.A. Via Emilia Parmense, 164, Fraz. Montale 29100 Piacenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrari, Maurizio Stefano Via Gino Cerri, 11 26026 Pizzighettone (Cremona) / IT | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria C/o Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito 18 40126 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria Bugnion S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 07110737.9 | 21.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | IT2006BO00500 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: IT BO20060500 | [2008/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1872898 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1872898 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872898 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/01, B23Q1/54 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
B23Q1/012 (EP,US);
B23Q1/5412 (EP,US);
B23Q2220/006 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307672 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307728 (EP,US);
Y10T409/308288 (EP,US);
Y10T409/308512 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine mit einem Portal und einem Werkzeughalter mit zwei zueinander senkrechten Drehachsen | [2008/01] | English: | Machine tool comprising a gantry and a tool holder with two perpendicular rotational axes | [2008/01] | French: | Machine-outil à portique avec porte-outil à deux axes de rotation perpendiculaires | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | CZ | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | EE | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | LT | 23.12.2009 | LV | 23.12.2009 | MT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | PL | 23.12.2009 | RO | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | SI | 23.12.2009 | SK | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | BG | 23.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | IS | 23.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | IE | 21.06.2010 | LU | 21.06.2010 | HU | 24.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
LU | 21.06.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
HU | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
MT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
IT | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.06.2010 | ||
IT | 21.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2009 | ||
EE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
RO | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SK | 23.12.2009 | ||
BG | 23.03.2010 | ||
IS | 23.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
LT | 23.12.2009 | ||
LV | 23.12.2009 | ||
PL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
SI | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE20204365U (DECKEL MAHO PFRONTEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-13,16 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 8; | [Y]DE10348691 (SHW WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8* figures 1,2 * |