EP1870782 - Image heating device using induction heating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2007/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Koki CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Shouhei CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Wakahara, Shinichiro CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shirakata, Jiro CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Takematsu, Koji CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Nishimura, Koichiro CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park GB-Uxbridge UB11 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07110810.4 | 21.06.2007 | [2007/52] | Priority number, date | JP20060172719 | 22.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006172719 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870782 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G03G15/2053 (EP,US);
G03G15/2039 (EP,US);
G03G2215/20 (EP,US);
G03G2215/2006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Title | German: | Bilderwärmungsvorrichtung mit Induktionserwärmung | [2007/52] | English: | Image heating device using induction heating | [2007/52] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage dýimage en utilisant un chauffage par induction | [2007/52] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 18.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000162912 (CANON KK) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] *; | [A]WO2005062133 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, lines 9-17; figures 2,4 * * page 13, lines 1-7,20-22 ** page 21, line 4 - page 24, line 4 *; | [A]JP2005208623 (CANON KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005221575 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2005207805 (TSUEDA YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0021]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2006086722 (TAKEMATSU KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0007] , [0050] , [0070] , [0071]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | JP2000162912 |