EP1874036 - Color adjustment method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woolfe, Geoffrey J. 4952 Hillcrest Drive Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Woolfe, Geoffrey J. 4952 Hillcrest Drive Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2017/13] |
Former [2008/01] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07110925.0 | 25.06.2007 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | US20060479484 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: US 479484 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874036 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1874036 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874036 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60, G06F17/30 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
H04N1/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/13] |
Former [2009/27] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Farbeinstellung | [2008/01] | English: | Color adjustment method | [2008/01] | French: | Procédé de réglage des couleurs | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 23.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5611030 (STOKES MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XY]JPH11194866 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,12 * Abstract; par.63-65; fig.7. * [Y] 3,5-7; | [Y]US7031920 (DOWLING KEVIN J [US], et al) [Y] 3,5-7 * column 2, lines 32-50 * * column 4, lines 13-58 *; | [PA]US2007100786 (MORONEY NATHAN M [US]) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X] - DISCLOSED ANONYMOUSLY, "Method to translate color requirements from a natural language-like representation into standard color references", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20060301), vol. 503, no. 65, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007136036 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH11194866 | US7031920 | - "Method to translate colour requirements from a natural language-like representation into standard colour references", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, (20060301), vol. 503, no. 65 |