EP1905598 - Ink circulation system, inkjet recording apparatus, and ink circulation method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 442-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Sung-wook 101,2/3 77-15 Hwagok 5-dong, Gangseo-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Haida, Kazuo 427-2003 Sibeomdanji Hyundai Apartment Seohyeong-dong, Bundang-gu, Gyeonggi-do Seongnam-si / KR | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Waddington, Richard Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Waddington, Richard Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07112100.8 | 09.07.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | KR20060096173 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: KR 20060096173 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1905598 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1905598 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/18, B41J2/19 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
B41J2/18 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17 (KR);
B41J2/17596 (EP,US);
B41J2/19 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | B41J2/175, B41J2/18 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/47] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenzirkulationssystem, Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsvorrichtung und Tintenzirkulationsverfahren dafür | [2008/14] | English: | Ink circulation system, inkjet recording apparatus, and ink circulation method thereof | [2008/14] | French: | Système de circulation d'encre, appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre et procédé de circulation d'encre correspondant | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5936650 (OUCHIDA DONALD B [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 67; figures 1,7,8 *; | [A]US6217164 (HINO MOTOHITO [JP]) [A] 1-40* column 10, line 25 - column 11, line 26; figure 2 *; | [A]US2002196316 (NAKAMURA HIROTAKE [JP]) [A] 1-40 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1658978 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-40 * paragraphs [0032] , [0036] , [0055] - [0057]; figures 3,10 * |