EP1849580 - Plastic bonding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, PT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2014/52] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states KURARAY CO., LTD. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-8622 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Tatsufumi@c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Junichi@c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 03 /
Nagasawa, Atsushi@c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 04 /
Hiramatsu, Shinji@c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 05 /
Fujisawa, Katsuya@c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2014/52] |
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
Watanabe, Tatsufumi c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanaka, Junichi c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
03 /
Nagasawa, Atsushi c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
04 /
Hiramatsu, Shinji c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | |||
05 /
Fujisawa, Katsuya c/o Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu, Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112115.6 | 08.03.2004 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20030061444 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003061444 | JP20030061445 | 07.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003061445 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849580 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1849580 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849580 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/00, C08J5/12, C08J7/18, C09J5/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C09J5/02 (EP,US);
B29C65/14 (EP,KR,US);
B29C65/004 (EP,US);
B29C65/006 (EP,US);
B29C65/8223 (EP);
B29C66/02 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/742 (EP);
B29C66/7461 (EP);
B29C66/7465 (EP);
B29C66/7487 (EP);
C08J5/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/18 (KR);
B29C65/1406 (EP,US);
B29C66/0014 (EP,US);
B29C66/0016 (EP,US);
B29C66/0242 (EP,US);
B29C66/026 (EP,US);
B29C66/028 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/712 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0079 (EP,US);
B29L2011/00 (EP);
B29L2031/747 (EP,US);
B29L2031/756 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2001/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/08 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2025/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2029/04 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/08 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Title | German: | Kunststoffverbindungsverfahren | [2007/44] | English: | Plastic bonding method | [2007/44] | French: | Procédé de liaison plastique | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04718440.3 / EP1604804 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040718440) is 17.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2004 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | IE | 08.03.2015 | LU | 08.03.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | PT | 24.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000266932 ; | [Y]JP2000249836 ; | [Y]EP0467096 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, lines 38-45 *; | [DY]US5396350 (BEESON KARL W [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * column 13, lines 34,35 *; | [Y]WO0121384 (NEYER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 2-7 * * page 3, line 14 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 6 * * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 4 * * page 5, lines 13-15 * * page 6, lines 25,26 * * page 7, lines 11-14 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000266932 A 20000929 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000249836 A 20000914 (KURARAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] * |