EP1849547 - Controller for wire electric discharge machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
LI
FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | [2011/08] |
Former [2007/44] | For:CH
LI
Fanuc Ltd 3580, Shibokusa, Aza-komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurihara, Masaki 2-34-18, Okusawa Setagaya-ku, Yamanashi 158-0083 / JP | 02 /
Hiraga, Kaoru Room 10-106, FANUC Manshonharimomi 3511-1 Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0511 / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07112848.2 | 23.03.2004 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20030079935 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003079935 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849547 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1849547 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849547 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/04, B23H7/20 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B23H7/20 (EP,US);
B23H7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, LI [2007/44] | Title | German: | Steuerung für eine elektrische Drahterodiermaschine | [2007/44] | English: | Controller for wire electric discharge machine | [2007/44] | French: | Contrôleur pour machine à décharge électrique faisant appel à un fil | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04251666.6 / EP1462202 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040251666) is 14.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4392041 (YATOMI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* abstract *; | [A]EP0934791 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 25 - line 34 * * page 2, line 39 - line 54 * * page 4, line 12 - line 18 * * page 5, line 39 - line 56 * * page 6, line 8 - line 19 * * page 7, line 14 - line 22 * | by applicant | EP0934791 |