10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
21.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
28.09.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
20.10.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
16.10.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.10.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.06.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
25.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2009 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
19.09.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
22.08.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
13.08.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2008 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
31.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] |
31.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|