Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9270470 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2015127948 | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | US201514595447 | 13.01.2015 | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | US201414155712 | 15.01.2014 | US59356105 | 24.03.2005 | US201213561250 | 30.07.2012 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | US201113011275 | 21.01.2011 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | US87873407 | 26.07.2007 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8972737 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2014129842 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | US201414155712 | 15.01.2014 | US59356105 | 24.03.2005 | US201213561250 | 30.07.2012 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | US201113011275 | 21.01.2011 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | US87873407 | 26.07.2007 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8667291 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2014 | B2 | US2012290846 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | US59356105 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | US201213561250 | 30.07.2012 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | US201113011275 | 21.01.2011 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | US87873407 | 26.07.2007 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8261084 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2012 | B2 | US2011119493 | 19.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | US59356105 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | US201113011275 | 21.01.2011 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | US87873407 | 26.07.2007 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7743261 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2010 | B2 | US2008034443 | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | US59356105 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | US87873507 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7900062 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2011 | B2 | US2008034442 | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | US59356105 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | US87873407 | 26.07.2007 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7549061 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2009 | B2 | US2007198838 | 23.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4654258B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | B2 | JP2008176814 | 31.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2008070185 | 18.03.2008 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4084827B | Global Dossier | 30.04.2008 | B2 | JP2007535189 | 29.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4654219B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2011 | B2 | JP2007274717 | 18.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2007123683 | 08.05.2007 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4607144B | Global Dossier | 05.01.2011 | B2 | JP2007274716 | 18.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2007123682 | 08.05.2007 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1850258 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2008 | A3 | EP1850258 | 31.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | EP05727373 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1730619 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2011 | B1 | EP1730619 | 13.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005227472B | Global Dossier | 09.12.2010 | B2 | AU2005227472 | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1840782 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2017 | B1 | EP1840782 | 13.02.2008 | A3 | EP1840782 | 03.10.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | EP05727373 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE509321T | 15.05.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0509577 | 12.12.2017 | B1 | BRPI0509577 | 25.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2560395 | 17.06.2014 | C | CA2560395 | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100419625C | 17.09.2008 | C | CN1961274 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2363517T | 08.08.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005JP06215 | 24.03.2005 | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005096119 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101067613B | Global Dossier | 28.09.2011 | B1 | KR20060135934 | 29.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101086759B | 20.06.2012 | B | CN101086759 | 12.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101086880B | 02.06.2010 | B | CN101086880 | 12.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101329714B | 17.06.2015 | B | CN101329714 | 24.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2660165T | 21.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY147696 | 15.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY150302 | 31.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI366775B | 21.06.2012 | B | TW200539706 | 01.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI364683B | 21.05.2012 | B | TW200816021 | 01.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI364685B | 21.05.2012 | B | TW200821892 | 16.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004206335 | 13.07.2004 | JP2004196531 | 02.07.2004 | JP2004151621 | 21.05.2004 | JP2004201009 | 07.07.2004 | JP2004110069 | 02.04.2004 | JP2004163734 | 01.06.2004 | JP2004146963 | 17.05.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1730619 |