EP1840782 - Unauthorized contents detection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/47] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nonaka, Masao c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Futa, Yuichi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Nakano, Toshihisa c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Yokota, Kaoru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Ohmori, Motoji c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Miyazaki, Masaya c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
Yamamoto, Masaya c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7 F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
Murase, Kaoru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
Onoda, Senichi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin OBP, Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2017/47] |
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
Nonaka, Masao c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
02 /
Futa, Yuichi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakano, Toshihisa c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
04 /
Yokota, Kaoru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
05 /
Ohmori, Motoji c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
06 /
Miyazaki, Masaya c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamamoto, Masaya c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7 F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
08 /
Murase, Kaoru c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | |||
09 /
Onoda, Senichi c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Dvpt Center 7F Twin OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/47] |
Former [2007/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07112869.8 | 24.03.2005 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20040110069 | 02.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004110069 | JP20040146963 | 17.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004146963 | JP20040151621 | 21.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004151621 | JP20040163734 | 01.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004163734 | JP20040196531 | 02.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004196531 | JP20040201009 | 07.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004201009 | JP20040206335 | 13.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004206335 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1840782 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1840782 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840782 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/1077 (EP,US);
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G06F21/64 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Erkennung nicht autorisierter Inhalte | [2007/40] | English: | Unauthorized contents detection system | [2007/40] | French: | Système de détection de contenus non autorisés | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05727373.2 / EP1730619 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050727373) is 15.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2005 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | IE | 24.03.2018 | LU | 24.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.03.2005 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 24.03.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 24.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/42] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 22.11.2017 | |
LT | 22.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0781003 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-36 * * column 5, line 15 - column 7, line 42 *; | [A]US2002004906 (RAJASEKHARAN AJIT V [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** the whole document *; | [Y]US2003023856 (HORNE WILLIAM G [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0069] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0082] * * paragraphs [0092] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0114] - [0116] * * paragraphs [0125] - [0133] *; | [Y]US6574676 (MEGIDDO NIMROD [US]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 18-25 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 67 *; | [A] - HORNE B ET AL, "Dynamic self-checking techniques for improved tamper resistance", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE (SECURITY AND PRIVACY IN DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT. ACM CCS-8 WORKSHOP DRM 2001. REVISED PAPERS, NOVEMBER 5, 2001, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA.), SPRINGER-VERLAG BERLIN, GERMANY, (2002), vol. 2320, ISBN 3-540-43677-4, pages 141 - 159, XP002459939 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0781003 | US2002004906 | US2003023856 | US6574676 |